SB493
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Revenue

Creates the Mining Oversight and Accountability Commission and revises the provisions governing certain mining taxes and fees. (BDR 32-1152)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 449.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Apr 05, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     Apr 12, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action   After Passage Discussion
  Senate Revenue     Apr 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 18, 2011     12:40 PM          Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Revenue     May 18, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Revenue     Jun 03, 2011     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Revenue     Jun 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue     Jun 05, 2011     10:35 PM          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 06, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (4th Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 464     Amend. No. 893     Amend. No. 927     Amend. No. 980   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 464.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Revenue.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Revenue. To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 893.) To printer.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 05, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 927.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.

Jun 06, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 980.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 3.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 980 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 449.
  • Sections 1 to 12, inclusive, and 13 to 18, inclusive effective June 16, 2011. Section 12.5 effective January 1, 2012. Section 12.7 effective January 1, 2014.