SJR15
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Revenue

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove the separate tax rate and manner of assessing and distributing the tax on mines and the proceeds of mines. (BDR C-1151)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 44.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Apr 05, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     Apr 12, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Revenue     Apr 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     May 18, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 28, 2011   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 06, 2011   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Waiver granted effective: 04/14/2011

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 26, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 44.
  • Return to 2013 Session