AB550
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning state ports of entry. (BDR S-892)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 09, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 919   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 919.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Vetoed by the Governor.