AB561
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 28, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Makes various changes concerning governmental financial administration. (BDR 31-1166)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 476.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 28, 2011     11:10 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 19, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 03, 2011     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue     May 17, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 25, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 26, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 04, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 5-26-11   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Revenue     Jun 06, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 36,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 930   

Bill History

Mar 28, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 30, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 930.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 36, Nays: 6.)
  • To printer.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 476.
  • Sections 1, 7 to 16, inclusive, and 17 of this act effective June 16, 2011. Sections 4.5 and 6 of this act effective July 1, 2011. Sections 4 and 6.5 of this act effective July 1, 2011, and expire by limitation on June 30, 2013. Section 5 of this act effective on the date that the balance of the separate account required by subsection 8 of NRS 408.235 is reduced to zero.