SB498
Introduced in the Senate on May 07, 2011.
By: Finance

Expands the authorized use of proceeds from the additional fee for each ticket sold for admission to a live professional contest of unarmed combat. (BDR 41-1285)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     May 06, 2011     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 01, 2011     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 25, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 01, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

May 07, 2011

  • Read first time.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

May 09, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 20, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 23, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 25, 2011

May 26, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 01, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.