SB500
Introduced in the Senate on May 10, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises the legislative districts from which members of the Senate and Assembly are elected and revises the districts from which Representatives of Congress are elected. (BDR 17-1291)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

May 10, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

May 11, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)