AB568
Introduced in the Assembly on May 10, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Ensures sufficient funding for K-12 public education for the 2011-2013 biennium. (BDR S-1292)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 10, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 10, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Jun 05, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 10, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 10, 2011   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

May 10, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 16, 2011

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 17, 2011

  • Returned to Assembly with Governor's veto message.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Bill read.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • (No further action taken.)