AB569
Introduced in the Assembly on May 11, 2011.
By: Ways and Means

Imposes a Nevada transaction tax. (BDR 32-1290)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Taxation     May 12, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     May 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     May 14, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     May 17, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     May 19, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     May 20, 2011     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

May 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)