AB575
Introduced in the Assembly on May 31, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Makes various changes relating to the Legislature and the Legislative Counsel Bureau. (BDR 17-233)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 528.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 31, 2011     03:55 PM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     05:39 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 03, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 06, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

May 31, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Jun 01, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 528.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.