AB577
Introduced in the Assembly on May 31, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Makes various changes concerning bill draft requests. (BDR 17-943)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 500.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 31, 2011     03:55 PM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     05:39 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda          Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 889   

Bill History

May 31, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Jun 01, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 889.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 500.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.