AB578
Introduced in the Assembly on May 31, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises the interim committee structure of the Legislature. (BDR 17-942)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 31, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 31, 2011     03:55 PM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     05:39 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 967   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 887     Amend. No. 976   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 967   

Bill History

May 31, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Jun 01, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 887.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 976.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 976 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Vetoed by the Governor.