AB64
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 15, 2010.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-302)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 14, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 15, 2010

  • Prefiled. Referred to Concurrent Committees on Education and Transportation. To printer.

Dec 27, 2010

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committees.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)