SB99
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 25, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Makes various changes concerning consumer protection. (BDR 52-127)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 519.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 16, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 23, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 29, 2011   Yea 37,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 305     Amend. No. 723     Amend. No. CA19   

Bill History

Jan 25, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Jan 26, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 305.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 723.) To printer.

May 26, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 723 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 723 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 723 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.

Jun 08, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 519.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.