SB110
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 02, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee

Revises provisions governing the issuance of business licenses in certain counties and cities in this State. (BDR 20-820)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 521.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 02, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 07, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 12, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 10, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 47     Amend. No. 594   

Bill History

Feb 02, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 03, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 47.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 594.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 594 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 521.
  • Effective June 17, 2011.