SB114
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 03, 2011.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to controlled substances. (BDR 40-190)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 25, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 04, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 07, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 83   

Bill History

Feb 03, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 04, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 83.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2011

Apr 08, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 17, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2011

May 19, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 102.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.