AB120
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 03, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horne

Revises provisions governing certain insurance for motor vehicles. (BDR 43-813)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 01, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 03, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 04, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)