AB122
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 03, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Livermore

Revises provisions concerning the imposition of certain reasonable restrictions or requirements relating to systems for obtaining wind energy. (BDR 22-592)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 217.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 28, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 28, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 27, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 508     Amend. No. 543     Amend. No. 707   

Bill History

Feb 03, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 04, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 508.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 543.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 707.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 29, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 707 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 217.
  • Effective June 2, 2011.