SB125
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 03, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kieckhefer

Revises provisions governing reporting of campaign contributions and expenses. (BDR 24-777)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 24, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 28, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 17, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 23, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 29, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 760   

Bill History

Feb 03, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 04, 2011

  • From printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 23, 2011

Mar 24, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 760.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 760 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 329.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.