AB123
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 04, 2011.
By: Health and Human Services

Makes various changes relating to certain facilities that provide health and related care. (BDR 40-159)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 386.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 16, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 21, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 20, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 38,   Nay 3,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 127     Amend. No. 905   

Bill History

Feb 04, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 127.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 11, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 905.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 386.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.