AB125
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 04, 2011.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions concerning the reporting of crimes against older persons. (BDR 14-154)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 27.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 21, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 05, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 27, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 02, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 157   

Bill History

Feb 04, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 157.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 28, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2011

May 06, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 09, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 27.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.