AB126
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 04, 2011.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes concerning vulnerable persons. (BDR 18-153)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 21, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 05, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 15, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 04, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)