SB126
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 04, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer, Lee

Revises certain provisions relating to permits to carry concealed firearms. (BDR 15-335)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 319.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 16, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 03, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 30, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 09, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 10, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 30, 2011   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 04, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 07, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 09, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 10, 2011

Mar 11, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 319.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.