SB129
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 04, 2011.
By: Health and Human Services

Requires training of certain persons who operate or work in certain facilities. (BDR 40-155)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 377.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 07, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     May 31, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 237   

Bill History

Feb 04, 2011

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 07, 2011

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 25, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 237.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 01, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

Jun 02, 2011

Jun 03, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 377.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.