SB135
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 08, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Rhoads

Revises provisions governing the presumption of eligibility for coverage for certain occupational diseases. (BDR 53-717)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 16, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 16, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 401     Amend. No. 757   

Bill History

Feb 08, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 09, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 401.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 06, 2011

  • Withdrawn from committee.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor.
  • To committee.

May 27, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 757.) To printer.

May 28, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 30, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)