AB131
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions governing certain occupational diseases for employees in certain professions. (BDR 53-688)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 09, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 21, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)