ACR4
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Expresses support for economic development in Nevada in the sectors of logistics, supply chain management and renewable energy technology. (BDR R-174)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government:
Effect on State:

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 11.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 09, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 21, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Be adopted
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Mar 09, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 15, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Mar 16, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Be adopted
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     May 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 11, 2011

  • Resolution read. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 22, 2011

  • From committee: Be adopted.

Feb 23, 2011

  • Resolution read and adopted. To Senate.

Feb 24, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Resolution read. Referred to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment. To committee.

Mar 21, 2011

  • From committee: Be adopted.

Mar 22, 2011

  • Taken from Resolution File. Placed on Resolution File for next legislative day.

Mar 23, 2011

  • Resolution read and adopted. To Assembly.

Mar 24, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Mar 29, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 11.