AB133
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2011.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to renewable energy. (BDR 58-152)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 09, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 23, 2011     04:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 28, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)