SB144
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 10, 2011.
By: Transportation

Requires certain garages to check and adjust the tire pressure of motor vehicles. (BDR 43-220)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Feb 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 11, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Transportation     May 12, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 22, 2011   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 10, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 11, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)