AB132
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2011.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Revises provisions governing the dates for certain elections. (BDR 24-684)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 218.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 10, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 15, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 12, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 27, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 241     Amend. No. 687   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 241.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 687.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

May 28, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 687 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 218.
  • Effective June 2, 2011.