SB146
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 14, 2011.
By: Revenue

Makes various changes relating to biodiesel. (BDR 32-218)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue     Feb 17, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 30, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 07, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 08, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 14, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer.

Feb 15, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 18, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)