AB141
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Goicoechea, Ellison, Hansen

Revises the frequency with which certain volunteer firefighters must submit to physical examinations to receive workers' compensation coverage for certain occupational diseases. (BDR 53-567)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 124.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 21, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 37,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 284   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 284.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 5.)
  • To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 14, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

May 23, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 26, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 27, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 124.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.