AB142
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall, Horne, Frierson, Pierce, Munford, Aizley, Carlton, Carrillo, Daly, Diaz, Dondero Loop, Flores, Hickey, Kirkpatrick, Kirner, Mastroluca, Segerblom, Smith

Makes various changes governing crimes against property. (BDR 15-599)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 41.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 18, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 28, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 11, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 21, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 25, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 02, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 61   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 61.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 02, 2011

May 06, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 09, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 12, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 41.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.