AB143
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien, Smith, Goicoechea, Horne, Oceguera, Conklin, Daly, Ellison, Hardy

Revises certain provisions concerning permits to carry concealed firearms. (BDR 15-118)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 165.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 28, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 11, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 30, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Senate Judiciary     May 17, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 18, 2011   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 20, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2011

Apr 19, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 19, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 20, 2011

May 23, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 26, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 165.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.