AB144
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kirkpatrick, Oceguera, Smith, Conklin, Atkinson, Aizley, Anderson, Benitez-Thompson, Bobzien, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Carrillo, Daly, Diaz, Dondero Loop, Ellison, Flores, Frierson, Goicoechea, Grady, Hammond, Hardy, Hogan, Horne, Livermore, Mastroluca, Munford, Neal, Ohrenschall, Pierce, Stewart

Makes various changes relating to bidder preferences on state and local public works projects. (BDR 28-64)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 20.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Feb 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 14, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 16, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 23, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Feb 25, 2011     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 07, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Mar 07, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Mar 09, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 25, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 25, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 28, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 09, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After passage discussion
  Assembly Government Affairs     Jun 01, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After passage discussion
  Senate Finance     Jun 02, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment     Jun 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb 18, 2011   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 51   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 14, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 16, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 17, 2011

  • Read second time.

Feb 18, 2011

Feb 21, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Feb 23, 2011

  • From committee: Rerefer to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment.
  • Rereferred to Select Committee on Economic Growth and Employment. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 51.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 51 concurred in. To enrollment.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 20.
  • Effective April 27, 2011.