SB147
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 14, 2011.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Establishes civil liability for knowingly advising certain persons to misrepresent the classification or duties of employees for the purposes of industrial insurance. (BDR 53-167)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 14, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 15, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)