AB145
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 14, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Goicoechea

Requires the posting of certain notices of a proposed annexation of an area by an unincorporated town under certain circumstances. (BDR 21-11)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 125.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 04, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 59   

Bill History

Feb 14, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 15, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 59.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 14, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

May 23, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 26, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 27, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 125.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.