AB147
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 14, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mastroluca, Ohrenschall, Benitez-Thompson, Dondero Loop, Flores, Frierson

Revises provisions relating to the termination of parental rights. (BDR 11-116)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 35.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 03, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 11, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 19, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 11, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 02, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 60   

Bill History

Feb 14, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 15, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 60.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2011

Apr 14, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 02, 2011

May 06, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 09, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 12, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 35.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.