AB149
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 14, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Segerblom, Pierce, Ohrenschall, Aizley, Benitez-Thompson, Carlton, Diaz, Flores, Frierson, Horne, Munford, Neal, Parks, Breeden, Kihuen, Leslie, Manendo

Makes various changes concerning medical and dental malpractice claims. (BDR 3-762)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 17, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 17, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 474   

Bill History

Feb 14, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 15, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 474.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 16.)
  • To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)