AB150
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 14, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien, Atkinson, Conklin, Oceguera, Smith, Benitez-Thompson, Bustamante Adams, Frierson, Hickey, Kirkpatrick, Kirner, Mastroluca, Pierce, Horsford, Schneider, Leslie

Revises provisions governing portfolio standards for providers of electric service. (BDR 58-848)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 53.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 23, 2011     04:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 20, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 10, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 14, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 15, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 07, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 10, 2011

May 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 53.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.