AB171
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Benitez-Thompson, Smith, Carrillo, Daly, Diaz, Dondero Loop, Frierson, Kirkpatrick, Neal, Pierce, Denis, Kihuen

Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-812)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 483.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 28, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Senate Education     Apr 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 26, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 24, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     Jun 01, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Education     Jun 03, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 420     Amend. No. 787     Amend. No. 840   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 420.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 787.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 840.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 31, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 05, 2011

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 483.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.