AB180
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horne, Ohrenschall, Pierce, Aizley, Anderson, Atkinson, Bobzien, Conklin, Flores, Frierson, Hardy, Kirkpatrick, Oceguera, Segerblom, Smith, Schneider, Parks, Leslie, Breeden, Copening, Roberson, Settelmeyer

Makes various changes to provisions governing eminent domain. (BDR 3-115)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 16, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 24, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 16, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 17, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)