SB168
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy, Gustavson

Makes various changes concerning public health. (BDR 54-837)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 470.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 23, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 16, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 08, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Jun 01, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 269     Amend. No. 881   

Bill History

Feb 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 269.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.
  • To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 881.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 881 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 05, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 881 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 881.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 470.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.