AB188
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 18, 2011.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions governing motor vehicles. (BDR 43-899)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Feb 17, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 15, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 12, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Transportation     May 05, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 09, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 09, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 18, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Feb 21, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 08, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)