AB189
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 18, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horne, Atkinson, Kirkpatrick, Conklin, Oceguera, Aizley, Bobzien, Carrillo, Daly, Diaz, Dondero Loop, Frierson, Ohrenschall, Segerblom, Smith

Authorizes certain tax credits for qualified investments in Nevada small businesses. (BDR 32-804)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Feb 24, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 18, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 21, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 08, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)