SB181
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 21, 2011.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Enacts provisions relating to energy efficiency, renewable energy and building construction. (BDR 54-219)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 28, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 17, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 22, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)