SB182
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Makes various changes concerning renewable energy systems. (BDR 58-286)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 239.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 28, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 07, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 14, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 08, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 195   

Bill History

Feb 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 22, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 195.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 30, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 239.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.