AB191
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin, Kirkpatrick, Bustamante Adams, Neal, Oceguera, Atkinson, Diaz, Dondero Loop, Flores, Mastroluca

Revises provisions governing the partial abatement of certain taxes. (BDR 32-916)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Feb 24, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 14, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 30, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 314   

Bill History

Feb 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 22, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 08, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 314.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)