AB199
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 22, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith, Atkinson, Horne, Conklin, Bobzien, Daly, Dondero Loop, Hickey, Kirkpatrick, Mastroluca, Oceguera

Revises provisions governing the practice of pharmacy. (BDR 54-875)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 486.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 14, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 18, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 69     Amend. No. 658     Amend. No. CA21   

Bill History

Feb 22, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 69.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 27, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 658.) To printer.

May 28, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 658 concurred in.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Action of concurrence in Senate Amendment No. 658 reconsidered.
  • Senate Amendment No. 658 not concurred in. To Senate.

Jun 03, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 658 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly.
  • To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 658 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.

Jun 08, 2011

Jun 09, 2011

  • To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 486.
  • Effective June 17, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and October 1, 2011, for all other purposes.