AB200
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 22, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith, Bobzien, Horne, Conklin, Atkinson, Daly, Dondero Loop, Hickey, Kirkpatrick, Mastroluca, Oceguera

Authorizes a brew pub to obtain a special permit to transport donated malt beverages under certain circumstances. (BDR 32-508)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 163.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 08, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 22, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Revenue     May 10, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Revenue     May 12, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 24, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 20, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 22, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Feb 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 22, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 23, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 24, 2011

Mar 25, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To committee.

May 13, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 14, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

May 23, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 26, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 163.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.