SB193
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 24, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy, Hardy, Stewart

Makes various changes concerning the State Board of Cosmetology and persons and practices regulated by the Board. (BDR 54-637)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 482.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 02, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 16, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 21, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 13, 2011   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 568     Amend. No. CA3   

Bill History

Feb 24, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Feb 25, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 17, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 18, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 21, 2011

Mar 22, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 11, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 568.) To printer.

May 12, 2011

May 13, 2011

May 14, 2011

  • In Senate.

May 25, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 568 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 26, 2011

  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 568 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 568 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.

Jun 08, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 482.
  • Effective June 16, 2011, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks, including, without limitation, the approval of contracts, as needed to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2011, for all other purposes.